House
|
06/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|