House | 04/05/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |