House
|
07/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|