House | 11/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability subcommittee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |