Senate
|
07/31/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-045-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|