House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |