Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|