House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0307
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|