House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|