House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0800
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|