Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Public Safety and Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Public Safety and Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|