House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0531
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 103-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 103-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|