House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0312
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|