Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|