House | 06/26/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |