House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 016-008-000 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 017-010-000 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |