House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0314
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 043-012-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-016-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|