Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|