Senate | 04/26/2023 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-034-000 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |