Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|