House | 05/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |