House | 02/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |