Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|