House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0163
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|