House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |