House
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
To Violence Reduction & Prevention Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|