House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Pension Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|