House
|
06/12/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0100
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|