House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0325
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|