House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|