House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|