Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Postponed - Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-029-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|