House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0535
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 013-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|