House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0328
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|