House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0329
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|