Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |