Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-030-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 014-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 013-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|