House
|
12/08/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0570
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Governor Certifies Changes
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Both Houses Accepted Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Accept Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Do Adopt Assignments; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Accept Amendatory Veto - House Passed 109-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 077-009-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 077-009-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 077-009-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Approved For Consideration- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (d-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|