LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2878
Draft Versions
IL
Illinois House Bill HB2878
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois House Bill HB2878
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 16, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 17, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
November 9, 2023
Compare
Bill
May 26, 2023
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
December 11, 2023
Compare
Veto Response
Bill
October 24, 2023
Compare
Veto Message
Bill
August 15, 2023
Compare