House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |