House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |