House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|