House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 019-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |