House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
To Special Issues Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|