House | 06/26/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |