Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|