House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Housing; 012-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Housing; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|