House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|