House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|