House | 03/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |